EP3467835 - IMPROVED ALIGNMENT METHOD FOR NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emweb bvba Duigemhofstraat 101 3020 Herent / BE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deforche, Koen Emweb bvba Gemeentestraat 55 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [2024/03] |
Former [2019/15] | Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | Application number, filing date | 18175374.0 | 31.05.2018 | [2019/15] | Priority number, date | EP20170195217 | 06.10.2017 Original published format: EP 17195217 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467835 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3467835 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16B30/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G16B30/10 (EP,US);
G16B30/00 (US);
G06F17/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] |
Former [2019/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES AUSRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN | [2019/15] | English: | IMPROVED ALIGNMENT METHOD FOR NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ALIGNEMENT AMÉLIORÉ POUR SÉQUENCES D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 18.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 17.01.2024 | |
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 17.01.2024 | |
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 17.04.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 17.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - SAFA JAMMALI ET AL, "Aligning coding sequences with frameshift extension penalties", ALGORITHMS FOR MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (20170331), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s13015-017-0101-4, XP055443249 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 1 * * tables D(i,j); DF(i,j) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13015-017-0101-4 | [A] - JOTUN HEIN, "An algorithm combining DNA and protein alignment", J. THEOR. BIOL., (19940101), vol. 167, pages 169 - 174, XP055443079 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - VINCENT RANWEZ ET AL, "MACSE: Multiple Alignment of Coding SEquences Accounting for Frameshifts and Stop Codons", PLOS ONE, (20110916), vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0022594, page e22594, XP055221303 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 7, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0022594 | [XP] - Koen Deforche, "An alignment method for nucleic acid sequences against annotated genomes", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/200394, (20171011), URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/biorxiv/early/2017/10/11/200394.full.pdf, XP055445442 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/200394 | by applicant | US5701256 | US5856928 | US2009119313 | US8209130 | - S.B. NEEDLEMAN; C.D. WUNSCH, "A general method applicable to the search for similarities in the amino acid sequence of two proteins", Journal of Molecular Biology, (19700000), vol. 48, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(70)90057-4, pages 443 - 453, XP024011703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(70)90057-4 | - T.F. SMITH; M.S. WATERMAN, "Identification of Common Molecular Subsequences", Journal of Molecular Biology, (19810000), vol. 147, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(81)90087-5, pages 195 - 197, XP024015032 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(81)90087-5 | - O. GOTOH, "An improved algorithm for matching biological sequences", Journal of Molecular Biology, (19820000), vol. 162, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(82)90398-9, pages 705 - 708, XP024019365 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(82)90398-9 | - J. HEIN, "An algorithm combining DNA and protein alignment", Journal of Theoretical Biology, (19940000), vol. 167, no. 2, pages 169 - 174, XP055443079 | - R.R. STOCSITS; I.L. HOFACKER; C. FRIED; P.F. STADLER, "Multiple sequence alignments of partially coding nucleic acid sequences", BMC Bioinformatics, (20050000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2105-6-160, page 160, XP021000755 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-6-160 | - V. RANWEZ; S. HARISPE; F. DELSUC; E.J.P. DOUZERY, "MACSE: Multiple Alignment of Coding Sequences Accounting for Frameshifts and Stop Codons", PLoS ONE, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0022594, page e22594, XP055221303 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0022594 | - S. JAMMALI; E. KUITCHE; A. RACHATI; F. BELANGER; M. SCOTT; A. OUANGRAOUA, "Aligning coding sequences with frameshift extension penalties", Algorithms for Molecular Biology, (20170000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1186/s13015-017-0101-4, page 10, XP055443249 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13015-017-0101-4 | - S. HENIKOFF; J.G. HENIKOFF, "Amino Acid Substitution Matrices from Protein Blocks", PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, no. 22, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.22.10915, pages 10915 - 10919, XP002599751 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.22.10915 | - P. RICE; I. LONGDEN; A. BLEASBY, "EMBOSS: the European Molecular Biology Open Software Suite", Trends Genet, (20000000), vol. 16, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2, pages 276 - 277, XP004200114 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2 |