02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
12.07.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
28.05.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
01.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
25.10.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
04.08.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
26.07.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.07.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.03.2023 |
Change - inventor |
|
03.03.2023 |
Change - inventor |
|
03.03.2023 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.09.2019 |
First examination report |
|
18.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.06.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.06.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] |
14.06.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] |
07.06.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.11.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
30.07.2018 |
Change - representative |
|