EP3431477 - CONDENSED IMIDAZOLYLIMIDAZOLES AS ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Pharmasset LLC 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACON, Elizabeth 1218 Floribunda Avenue Apt. 8 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
COTTELL, Jeromy 701 Baltic Circle 719 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 03 /
KATANA, Ashley Anne 2201 Bridgepoint Parkway 205 San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | 04 /
KATO, Darryl 223 Connecticut Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 05 /
KRYGOWSKI, Evan 2231 California Street NW 507 Washington, DC 20008 / US | 06 /
LINK, John 74 Prospect Avenue San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 07 /
TAYLOR, James 100 State Street San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | 08 /
TRAN, Chinh Viet 10322 Baron Drive San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 09 /
MARTIN, Teresa Alejandra Trejo 3701 Naughton Ave Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 10 /
YANG, Zheng-Yu 338 El Carmelo Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 11 /
ZIPFEL, Sheila 22 N. San Mateo Drive Apt. 205 San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | [2020/42] |
Former [2019/04] | 01 /
BACON, Elizabeth 1218 Floribunda Avenue Apt. 8 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | ||
02 /
COTTELL, Jeromy 701 Baltic Circle 719 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | |||
03 /
KATANA, Ashley Anne 2201 Bridgepoint Parkway 205 San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | |||
04 /
KATO, Darryl 223 Connecticut Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | |||
05 /
KRYGOWSKI, Evan 2231 California Street NW 507 Washington, DC 20008 / US | |||
06 /
LINK, John 74 Prospect Avenue San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
07 /
TAYLOR, James 100 State Street San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | |||
08 /
TRAN, Chinh Viet 10322 Baron Drive San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
09 /
MARTIN, Teresa Alejandra Trejo 3701 Noughton Ave. Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
10 /
YANG, Zheng-Yu 338 El Carmelo Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
11 /
ZIPFEL, Sheila 22 N. San Mateo Drive Apt. 205 San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | Representative(s) | Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2020/42] |
Former [2019/04] | Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18175400.3 | 16.11.2012 | [2019/04] | Priority number, date | US201161560654P | 16.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161560654 P | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431477 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3431477 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/052, A61K31/4188 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
C07D491/052 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7056 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7064 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/07 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/21 (EP,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP,EA,KR);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4188, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7056, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7064, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7072, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | 31.05.2018 | ME | 31.05.2018 | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE IMIDAZOLYLIMIDAZOLE ALS ANTIVIRALE VERBINDUNGEN | [2019/04] | English: | CONDENSED IMIDAZOLYLIMIDAZOLES AS ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS | [2019/04] | French: | IMIDAZOLYLIMIDAZOLES CONDENSÉS EN TANT QUE COMPOSÉS ANTIVIRAUX | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 22.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12798525.7 / EP2635588 | EP15156617.1 / EP2907816 | Divisional application(s) | EP20194823.9 / EP3778606 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2012 | AL | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | MT | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | RS | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | LU | 16.11.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MT | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | DK | 14.10.2020 | |
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.11.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010062821 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-37 *; | [A]WO2010096777 (PRESIDIO PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-55 *; | [A]WO2011028596 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-26 *; | [A]WO2011066241 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]WO2011087740 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12* claims 1-15 *; | [XP]WO2012068234 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-12 * claims 1-324 * | by applicant | US4816570 | US4968788 | WO9119721 | WO9615111 | US5663159 | US5792756 | WO2006020276 | - Antimicrobial Agents and Chemotherapy, (20100900), vol. 54, pages 3641 - 3650 | - The Chemistry of Heterocyclic Compounds, A Series of Monographs, John Wiley & Sons, (19500000), vol. 13, 14, | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19600000), vol. 82, page 5566 | - "Design and Application of Prodrugs", BUNDGAARD, HANS, A Textbook of Drug Design and Development, Harwood Academic, (19910000), pages 113 - 191 | - FARQUHAR et al., J. Pharm. Sci., (19830000), vol. 72, page 324 | - DE LOMBAERT et al., J. Med. Chem., (19940000), vol. 37, page 498 | - KHAMNEI; TORRENCE, J. Med. Chem., (19960000), vol. 39, pages 4109 - 4115 | - MITCHELL et al., J. Chem. Soc. Perkin Trans., (19920000), page 112345 | - PUECH et al., Antiviral Res., (19930000), vol. 22, pages 155 - 174 | - BENZARIA et al., J. Med. Chem., (19960000), vol. 39, page 4958 | - Protecting Groups: An Overview, pages 1 - 20 | - Hydroxyl Protecting Groups, pages 21 - 94 | - Diol Protecting Groups, pages 95 - 117 | - Carboxyl Protecting Groups, pages 118 - 154 | - Carbonyl Protecting Groups, pages 155 - 184 | - IAN T. HARRISON; SHUYEN HARRISON, Compendium of Organic Synthetic Methods, John Wiley & Sons, (19710000), vol. 1 | - "Comprehensive Organic Synthesis", Selectivity, Strategy & Efficiency in Modern Organic Chemistry, Pergamon Press, (19930000), vol. 9 | - LOCHMULLER, C. H., J. Chromatogr., (19750000), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 283 - 302 | - ELIEL, E.; WILEN, S., Stereochemistry of Organic Compounds, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., (19940000), page 322 | - JACOB III., J. Org. Chem., (19820000), vol. 47, page 4165 | - OKAMOTO, J. of Chromatogr., (19900000), vol. 513, pages 375 - 378 |