EP3401818 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING AND TRANSMITTING SENSOR DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dexcom, Inc. 6340 Sequence Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2023/49] |
Former [2018/46] | For all designated states Dexcom, Inc. 6340 Sequence Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Thomas 18825 Santee Lane Valley Center, CA 92082 / US | 02 /
DERVAES, Mark 2950 Avenida Castana Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 03 /
LIEU, Phong 9909 Fieldthorn Street San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 04 /
SIMPSON, Peter C. 227 North Vulcan Avenue Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 05 /
LARVENZ, Shawn 23143 Stokes Road Ramona, CA 92065 / US | 06 /
LEACH, Jacob S. 4008 Honeycutt Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 07 /
BÖHM, Sebastian 5075 Fallenwood Lane San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/49] |
Former [2018/46] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18175412.8 | 12.02.2014 | [2018/46] | Priority number, date | US201313830330 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313830330 | US201313827577 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313827577 | US201314142677 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: US201314142677 | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3401818 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3401818 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/17, G16H40/40, G16H50/20, G16H40/67, // A61B5/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (US);
A61B5/0015 (US);
A61B5/076 (US);
A61B5/14503 (US);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/14865 (EP,US);
A61B5/6849 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (US);
A61B5/7475 (US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (US);
G16H40/20 (US);
G16H40/40 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | G06F19/00, // A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2019/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNG VON SENSORDATEN | [2018/46] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING AND TRANSMITTING SENSOR DATA | [2018/46] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAITER ET TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES DE CAPTEUR | [2018/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 14.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14708172.3 / EP2973082 | Divisional application(s) | EP23173573.9 / EP4235684 | EP23173577.0 / EP4220654 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2024
18.06.2024
ADMISSIBLE Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | 02
06.09.2024
09.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE Abbott GmbH Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2024
18.06.2024
ADMISSIBLE Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | 27.09.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | MC | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
PL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SK | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
PT | 08.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 06.12.2023 | |
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009291634 (SAARISALO MIKKO [FI]); | [A]US7643798 (LJUNG PETER [SE]); | [I]WO2013019225 (DRAEGER MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US4757022 | US4994167 | US6001067 | US6424847 | US6477395 | US6484046 | US6512399 | US2003032874 | US6558321 | US6565509 | US6579690 | US6702857 | US6741877 | US2005027463 | US2005033132 | US2005043598 | US6862465 | US2005051427 | US2005056552 | US2005090607 | US2005154271 | US2005176136 | US6931327 | US2005182451 | US2005192557 | US2005203360 | US2005245799 | US2006015020 | US2006020187 | US2006016700 | US2006020188 | US2006020190 | US2006020191 | US2006020192 | US2006036140 | US2006036143 | US2006040402 | US2006068208 | US2006142651 | US7074307 | US2006155180 | US7081195 | US2006198864 | US2006200020 | US2006200022 | US2006200970 | US2006204536 | US7108778 | US7110803 | US2006222566 | US2006224108 | US2006235285 | US2006249381 | US2006252027 | US2006253012 | US7134999 | US7136689 | US2006257995 | US2006258761 | US2006263763 | US2006270922 | US2006270923 | US2007016381 | US2007027385 | US2007027370 | US2007032706 | US2007032718 | US2007045902 | US2007059196 | US7192450 | US2007066873 | US7226978 | US2007173709 | US2007173710 | US2007203966 | US2007208245 | US2007208246 | US7276029 | US2007232879 | US7310544 | US2008033254 | US2008045824 | US2008083617 | US2008086044 | US7364592 | US7366556 | US2008108942 | US2008119703 | US2008119704 | US2008119706 | US7379765 | US2008183061 | US2008183399 | US2008188731 | US2008189051 | US2008194938 | US2008197024 | US2008200788 | US2008200789 | US2008200791 | US2008214915 | US7424318 | US2008228054 | US2008242961 | US2008262469 | US2008275313 | US2008287765 | US7460898 | US2008306368 | US2008306434 | US2008306435 | US2008306444 | US7467003 | US7471972 | US2009018424 | US2009030294 | US2009036758 | US2009036763 | US2009043181 | US2009043182 | US2009043525 | US2009045055 | US7494465 | US7497827 | US2009062633 | US2009062635 | US2009076360 | US7519408 | US2009099436 | US2009124877 | US2009124879 | US2009124964 | US2009131769 | US2009131777 | US2009137886 | US2009137887 | US2009143659 | US2009143660 | US2009156919 | US2009163790 | US2009178459 | US2009192366 | US2009192380 | US2009192722 | US2009192724 | US2009192751 | US2009203981 | US2009216103 | US7583990 | US7591801 | US2009240120 | US2009240193 | US2009242399 | US2009242425 | US2009247855 | US2009247856 | US7599726 | US7613491 | US7615007 | US2009287074 | US2009299155 | US2009299156 | US2009299162 | US7632228 | US7637868 | US7640048 | US2010010331 | US2010010332 | US2010016687 | US2010016698 | US7651596 | US7654956 | US7657297 | US2010030484 | US2010036215 | US2010036225 | US2010041971 | US2010045465 | US2010049024 | US2010076283 | US2010081908 | US2010081910 | US2010087724 | US2010096259 | US7711402 | US7713574 | US7715893 | US2010121169 | US2010161269 | US2010168540 | US2010168541 | US2010168542 | US2010168543 | US2010168544 | US2010168545 | US2010168546 | US2010168657 | US2010174157 | US2010174158 | US2010174163 | US2010174164 | US2010174165 | US2010174166 | US2010174167 | US2010179401 | US2010179402 | US2010179404 | US2010179408 | US2010179409 | US7761130 | US2010185065 | US2010185069 | US2010185070 | US2010185071 | US2010185075 | US2010191082 | US2010198035 | US2010198036 | US7771352 | US7774145 | US7775975 | US7778680 | US7783333 | US2010212583 | US2010217557 | US2010223013 | US2010223022 | US2010223023 | US7792562 | US2010228109 | US2010228497 | US7797028 | US2010240975 | US2010240976 | US2010261987 | US2010274107 | US7826981 | US2010280341 | US7828728 | US7831287 | US2010286496 | US7835777 | US2010298684 | US2010324403 | US7857760 | US7860545 | US2010331656 | US2010331657 | US2011004085 | US2011009727 | US7875293 | US7881763 | US2011024043 | US2011024307 | US2011027127 | US2011027453 | US2011027458 | US2011028815 | US2011028816 | US7885697 | US2011046467 | US7896809 | US7899511 | US7901354 | US7905833 | US7914450 | US7917186 | US2011077490 | US7920906 | US7925321 | US7927274 | US7933639 | US7935057 | US2011118579 | US7946984 | US7949381 | US2011124992 | US2011125410 | US2011130970 | US2011130971 | US2011130998 | US7955261 | US7959569 | US2011144465 | US7970448 | US7974672 | US7976492 | US7979104 | US2011178378 | US7986986 | US2011190614 | US7998071 | US8000901 | US2011201910 | US2011201911 | US8005524 | US8005525 | US8010174 | US2011218414 | US2011231140 | US2011231141 | US2011231142 | US2011253533 | US2011263958 | US8050731 | US2011270062 | US2011270158 | US8052601 | US8053018 | US2011275919 | US8060173 | US8060174 | US8064977 | US2011290645 | US8073519 | US8073520 | US2011313543 | US2011320130 | US2012035445 | US2012040101 | US8118877 | US2012046534 | US8128562 | US8133178 | US2012078071 | US8150488 | US8155723 | US8160669 | US8160671 | US8167801 | US8170803 | US2012108934 | US2012130214 | US8195265 | US8206297 | US2012172691 | US8216139 | US2012179014 | US8229534 | US8229535 | US8229536 | US2012186581 | US2012190953 | US2012191063 | US8231531 | US8233958 | US8233959 | US2012203467 | US2012209098 | US8249684 | US2012215086 | US2012215087 | US2012215201 | US2012215461 | US2012215462 | US2012215496 | US8251906 | US8255030 | US8255032 | US8255033 | US2012220979 | US8257259 | US8260393 | US2012226121 | US8265725 | US2012228134 | US2012238852 | US8275437 | US8275438 | US2012245448 | US2012245855 | US8277713 | US8280475 | US8282549 | US8282550 | US8285354 | US2012255875 | US2012258748 | US2012259191 | US2012260323 | US8287453 | US8290559 | US8290560 | US8290561 | US8290562 | US2012262298 | US2012265035 | US2012265036 | US2012265037 | US8292810 | US8298142 | US2012277562 | US2012277566 | US2012283541 | US2012283543 | US8311749 | US8313434 | US2012296311 | US8321149 | US2012302854 | US2012302855 | US8332008 | US2012323100 | US8346338 | US2013012798 | US8364229 | US2013030273 | US8369919 | US2013035575 | US2013035865 | US2013035871 | US8374667 | US8386004 | US2013053666 | US8394021 | US19990447227 | US20100828967 | Opposition | US2007142727 | US2010045425 | US2010198034 | US2011213225 | US2012255875 | WO2013090791 | US7643798 | US2012003933 |