EP3406223 - DENTAL ABUTMENT WITH POROUS SOFT TISSUE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/48] | DENTAL PROSTHETIC DEVICE WITH SOFT TISSUE BARRIER PROMOTION MATERIAL | ||
[2020/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Dental Inc. 1900 Aston Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLINS, Michael Scott 1607 Trenton Way San Marcos, California 92078 / US | 02 /
BASSETT, Jeffrey A. 1340 Palomar Place Vista, California 92084 / US | 03 /
CAHILL, Sean 31940 Calle Redondela Temecula, California 92592 / US | [2019/12] |
Former [2018/48] | 01 /
COLLINS, Michael 1104 Calistoga Way San Marcos, California 92078 / US | ||
02 /
BASSETT, Jeffrey A. 1340 Palomar Place Vista, California 92084 / US | |||
03 /
CAHILL, Sean 31940 Calle Redondela Temecula, California 92592 / US | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/24] |
Former [2018/48] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18176180.0 | 28.08.2008 | [2018/48] | Priority number, date | US20070847476 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: US 847476 | US20080167004 | 02.07.2008 Original published format: US 167004 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406223 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3406223 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
A61C8/0013 (EP);
A61C8/0012 (EP);
A61C8/005 (EP);
A61C8/006 (EP);
A61C8/0068 (EP);
A61C8/0075 (EP);
A61C8/0077 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2018/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DENTALES ABUTMENT MIT PORÖSER WEICHGEWEBSOBERFLÄCHE | [2020/03] | English: | DENTAL ABUTMENT WITH POROUS SOFT TISSUE SURFACE | [2020/03] | French: | PILIER DENTAIRE À SURFACE DE TISSU MOU POREUX | [2020/03] |
Former [2018/48] | ZAHNPROTHESENVORRICHTUNG MIT WEICHGEWEBEBARRIEREFÖRDERUNGSMATERIAL | ||
Former [2018/48] | DENTAL PROSTHETIC DEVICE WITH SOFT TISSUE BARRIER PROMOTION MATERIAL | ||
Former [2018/48] | DISPOSITIF DE PROTHÈSE DENTAIRE AVEC MATÉRIAU PROMOTEUR DE BARRIÈRE DE TISSU MOU | Examination procedure | 28.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 28.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08829319.6 / EP2205181 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2008 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | LU | 28.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/36] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 10.06.2020 | |
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4439152 (SMALL IRWIN A [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, lines 15-23, 49-53 *; | [XA]WO2006107292 (TRIMANUS MEDICAL LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,2 * last 2 lines; page 5 * * page 6, lines 3-5, 11-19 * * figures 2, 3 * [A] 3-14; | [A]WO2007027794 (ZIMMER DENTAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0002] , [00 7] *; | [X]US2007111165 (WALLICK MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2, 3, 5 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 19] , [0 28] * | by applicant | US5282861 | US5449291 | US20070847476 |