EP3578364 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A THREE DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSS Laser-Sinter-Service GmbH Gottlieb-Daimler-Straße 12 59439 Holzwickede / DE | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanning, Hermann Quellenstrasse 13 32758 Detmold / DE | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18176759.1 | 08.06.2018 | [2019/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3578364 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y10/00, B22F3/105, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/00, B29C64/153, B29C64/30, B29C64/245, B29C64/268 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B22F12/17 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/40 (EP,US);
B22F12/33 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP);
B29C64/245 (EP);
B29C64/268 (EP);
B29C64/30 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (EP);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/32 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2019/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER STRUKTUREN | [2019/50] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A THREE DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE | [2019/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE STRUCTURES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2019/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 10.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1358855 (BEGO MEDICAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0011] *; | [A]WO2004050323 (OBJET GEOMETRIES LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 2A ** paragraph [0088] *; | [Y]US2014264187 (LAKE CARLA [US], et al) [Y] 17 * claim 4 *; | [Y]WO2015149054 (EZ PRINT LLC [US], et al) [Y] 7 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0064] *; | [Y]DE102014004633 (CL SCHUTZRECHTSVERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 19 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0036] *; | [XY]US2016107229 (OKAZAKI SHUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,12-16 * figure 9 * * figure 1 * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0048] * [Y] 17-19; | [XY]US2017190120 (BLOOME CORY MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * figure 3A * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0027] * [Y] 7,18 | by applicant | WO2012160344 |