EP3415382 - PORTABLE TRAILER STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ideal Warehouse Innovations, Inc. 1 Royal Gate Blvd., Unit 1 Vaughan, Ontario L4L 8Z7 / CA | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DI BIASE, Joseph J. c/o Ideal Warehouse Innovations Inc. 1 Royal Gate Blvd., Unit 1 Vaughan, Ontario L4L 8Z7 / CA | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18177375.5 | 12.06.2018 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | US201762518351P | 12.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762518351 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415382 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60S13/00, B60D1/54, F16M11/28 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
B60D1/66 (EP,US);
B60S9/06 (US);
B60D1/665 (US);
B60S13/00 (EP,US);
B60S9/18 (US);
B60S9/22 (US);
B66F5/025 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARER ANHÄNGERSTÄNDER | [2018/51] | English: | PORTABLE TRAILER STAND | [2018/51] | French: | BÉQUILLE DE REMORQUE PORTATIVE | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4169581 (THURMOND ELMER T JR [US]) [A] 1,4,8,15 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4844393 (LEE YU [TW]) [A] 1,4,8,15 * figures 1,2,6 *; | [XDA]US2009108147 (DI BIASE JOSEPH J [CA]) [XD] 8 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,4,15; | [A]US2014166950 (WIEGEL AARON J [US], et al) [A] 1,4,8,15* figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US8016257 |