EP3528433 - DATA ANALYSES USING COMPRESSIVE SENSING FOR INTERNET OF THINGS (IOT) NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARJEE, JYOTIRMOY Tata Consultancy Services Limited ODC-4, 7th Floor, H-Block Gopalan Global Axis, (Opp.Satya Sai Hospital) Road Number 9, KIADB Export Promotion Industrial Area Whitelfield, Bengaluru- 560066, Karnataka / IN | 02 /
RATH, HEMANT KUMAR Tata Consultancy Services Limited Kalinga Park Plot-35, Patia Chandaka Industrial Estate 751024 Bhubaneswar, Odisha / IN | 03 /
PAL, ARPAN Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B,Ecospace Innovation Labs, Kolkata - STP 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 18177672.5 | 14.06.2018 | [2019/34] | Priority number, date | IN201821006047 | 16.02.2018 Original published format: IN201821006047 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528433 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3528433 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
H04L43/0823 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04L12/66 (US);
H04L41/147 (US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/04 (US);
H04L43/028 (EP,US);
H04L43/045 (EP,US);
H04L43/0829 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2019/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENANALYSEN MIT DRUCKERFASSUNG FÜR IOT-NETZWERKE | [2019/34] | English: | DATA ANALYSES USING COMPRESSIVE SENSING FOR INTERNET OF THINGS (IOT) NETWORKS | [2019/34] | French: | ANALYSES DE DONNÉES UTILISANT UNE DÉTECTION COMPRESSIVE POUR DES RÉSEAUX D'INTERNET DES OBJETS (IDO) | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 21.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2018 | AL | 17.02.2021 | AT | 17.02.2021 | CY | 17.02.2021 | CZ | 17.02.2021 | DK | 17.02.2021 | EE | 17.02.2021 | ES | 17.02.2021 | FI | 17.02.2021 | HR | 17.02.2021 | IT | 17.02.2021 | LT | 17.02.2021 | LV | 17.02.2021 | MC | 17.02.2021 | MK | 17.02.2021 | MT | 17.02.2021 | PL | 17.02.2021 | RO | 17.02.2021 | RS | 17.02.2021 | SE | 17.02.2021 | SI | 17.02.2021 | SK | 17.02.2021 | SM | 17.02.2021 | BG | 17.05.2021 | NO | 17.05.2021 | GR | 18.05.2021 | IE | 14.06.2021 | LU | 14.06.2021 | IS | 17.06.2021 | PT | 17.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
MK | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CY | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016196527 (BOSE PRASANTA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0133] *; | [A]US2016379165 (MOAKLEY GEORGE P [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] ** paragraph [0113] *; | [I]EP3223485 (CISCO TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0093] * * figure 11 * | by applicant | - 2010; L. BALZANO; R. NOWAK; B. RECHT, "Online Identification and Tracking of Subspaces from highly Incomplete Information", 48 Annual Allerton Conference on Communication, Control, and Computing | - J. KARJEE; H. JAMADAGNI, "Data Accuracy Models under Spatio-Temporal Correlation with Adaptive Strategies in Wireless Sensor Networks", ACEEE Int. J. on Network Security, (20130000), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 24 - 34 | - N. PATWARI; A. O. HERO, "Using proximity and quantized RSS for sensor networks and applications", 2nd ACM international conference on Wireless sensor networks and applications, (20030000), doi:doi:10.1145/941350.941354, pages 20 - 29, XP058096367 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/941350.941354 |