EP3581802 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE SUPPORT OF THE IMPELLER OF A RADIAL TURBOMACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilgenberg, Frederic Kasseler Str. 31 45145 Essen / DE | 02 /
Naß, Dieter Am Bendmannsfeld 15 d 47447 Moers / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18177778.0 | 14.06.2018 | [2019/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581802 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/62, F01D25/28, F04D29/26, F04D29/42 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
F04D29/624 (EP);
F04D29/266 (EP);
F04D29/4206 (EP);
F05D2230/64 (EP);
F05D2230/68 (EP);
F05D2230/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSTÜTZUNG EINES RADIALTURBOMASCHINENLAUFRADES | [2019/51] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE SUPPORT OF THE IMPELLER OF A RADIAL TURBOMACHINE | [2019/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPUI D'UN ROTOR DE TURBOMACHINE RADIALE | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP2644863 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1,4,6,8,9 * abstract * [A] 2,3,5,7; | [A]EP3324063 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]AU432760B (W.H. TIPPETT) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP3106670 | EP3061991 | EP3045686 | WO2016091495 | WO2016062549 | WO2016046037 | WO2015043879 | WO2014195390 | WO2012104366 | WO2012104153 |