Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
08.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.07.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.11.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |