EP3415464 - MICROELECTROMECHANICAL DEVICE HAVING AT LEAST ONE TRANSLATABLY GUIDED MOBILE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASPERO, Federico 43 Via Vergani 22063 CANTU (CO) / IT | 02 /
JOET, Loïc Le Parc Sorel Rue Beyle Stendhal 38640 CLAIX / FR | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18177857.2 | 14.06.2018 | [2018/51] | Priority number, date | FR20170055480 | 16.06.2017 Original published format: FR 1755480 | [2018/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415464 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3415464 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B81B3/00, G01P15/125 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
B81B7/02 (US);
B81B3/0051 (EP,US);
B81B3/0062 (US);
B81B5/00 (US);
B81B2201/0235 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | MIKROELEKTROMECHANISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM BEWEGLICHEN ELEMENT MIT SEITLICHER BEWEGUNGSFÜHRUNG | [2018/51] | English: | MICROELECTROMECHANICAL DEVICE HAVING AT LEAST ONE TRANSLATABLY GUIDED MOBILE ELEMENT | [2018/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF MICROELECTROMECANIQUE À AU MOINS UN ELEMENT MOBILE GUIDÉ EN TRANSLATION | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 18.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2018 | AL | 05.08.2020 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | IT | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | TR | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | NO | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
TR | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 14.06.2018 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
NO | 05.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006110304 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 7-10* abstract *; | [XYI]WO2013108705 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,14 * abstract * * figure 5 * [Y] 7-10 [I] 2-4,11-13,15; | [A]US8729770 (MILANOVIC VELJKO [US]) [A] 2-4 * abstract * * figure 3 * |