blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3413544

EP3413544 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INCOMING AND OUTGOING CALL INFORMATION IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2021
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.05.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2021No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2021  [2021/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2018/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Jeong-Sik
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Young-Jip
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Han, Young-Seop
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Choe, Jun-Young
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Lee, Kyung-Shin
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
06 / Lee, Tae-Soo
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2018/50]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Berliner Freiheit 2
10785 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/50]Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date18177894.522.12.2006
[2018/50]
Priority number, dateKR2005012897823.12.2005         Original published format: KR 20050128978
[2018/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3413544
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3413544
Date:17.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2018
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/56, H04M1/57, H04M1/2745, H04M1/663, H04M1/725
[2018/50]
CPC:
H04M1/27457 (EP,US); H04B1/40 (KR); H04M1/2746 (US);
H04M1/27 (KR); H04M1/56 (EP,US); H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04M1/663 (EP,US); H04M1/72469 (EP,US); H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04M1/64 (EP,US); H04M2250/60 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2019/16]
Former [2018/50]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON EIN- UND AUSGEHENDER ANRUFINFORMATION IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT[2018/50]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INCOMING AND OUTGOING CALL INFORMATION IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL[2018/50]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS SUR LES APPELS ENTRANTS ET SORTANTS DANS UN TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2018/50]
Examination procedure07.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2020Fee for grant paid
04.05.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.05.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06127108.6  / EP1802086
EP14153769.6  / EP2731318
Opposition(s)18.03.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
15.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
24.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[ID]US2003148790  (PAPPALARDO SUSAN ELIZABETH [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0026] , [0027]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0064]; figures 5-8 *;
 [AD]US2005085274  (LEE MYUNG-JAE [KR]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034]; figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0038] *;
 [AD]US2005129206  (MARTIN BRADLEY J [US]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0035]; figures 3-7 *;
 [A]US2005182798  (TODD MARC W [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figure 5 *
by applicantUS2003148790
 US2005085274
 US2005129206
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.