EP3406169 - ELECTRIC GRILL APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Professional S.p.A. Viale Treviso 15 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAUCCI, Flavio Electrolux Professional S.p.A. Viale Treviso 15 33170 Pordenone / IT | 02 /
TAYFUNOVA, Olena Electrolux Professional S.p.A. Viale Treviso 15 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 18178137.8 | 07.08.2015 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406169 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/07, A47J37/06 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
A47J37/0709 (EP,KR);
A47J37/0676 (EP,CN);
A47J37/0611 (RU);
A47J37/0629 (RU);
A47J37/0635 (EP,RU);
A47J37/067 (RU);
A47J37/0763 (EP,KR);
A47J37/0786 (EP,KR);
F24C7/04 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES GRILLGERÄT | [2018/48] | English: | ELECTRIC GRILL APPLIANCE | [2018/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE GRILL ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15180214.7 / EP3127458 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2013057004 (ARRIS CATERING EQUIPMENT S R L [IT]) [X] 1,2,13 * page 1, lines 5-22 * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 16 * * page 6, lines 18-20 * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 3,4,7,14 [I] 5,6,9-12,15; | [X]FR2899455 (SEB SA [FR]) [X] 1,13 * page 1, lines 5-17 * * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [YA]US2097793 (HOWELL CARTER M) [Y] 3,4,7 * page 1, column right, line 50 - page 2, column right, line 10; figure 2 * [A] 1,2,5,6,8; | [A]US2008164246 (HOYLES VICTOR [CA], et al) [A] 4-6 * figures 20-23 *; | [YDA]DE4306845 (ZURAN JOHANN DIPL ING [DE]) [YD] 14 * page 1, column right, lines 48-52,; figures 6, 9, 10 * [A] 1 | by applicant | DE4306845 |