EP3419285 - PROJECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CALIBRATING DISPLAY IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coretronic Corporation No.11, Li-Hsing Road Hsinchu Science Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, YUNG-CHIH c/o Coretronic Corporation No. 11, Li-Hsin Rd., Hsinchu Science Park 300 Hsin-Chu / TW | 02 /
CHENG, JE-FU c/o Coretronic Corporation No. 11, Li-Hsin Rd., Hsinchu Science Park 300 Hsin-Chu / TW | 03 /
YU, SU-YUN c/o Coretronic Corporation No. 11, Li-Hsin Rd., Hsinchu Science Park 300 Hsin-Chu / TW | 04 /
HSU, SHU-HAO c/o Coretronic Corporation No. 11, Li-Hsin Rd., Hsinchu Science Park 300 Hsin-Chu / TW | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 18178248.3 | 18.06.2018 | [2018/52] | Priority number, date | CN201710475228 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710475228 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419285 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3419285 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, // G06T3/00 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H04N9/3188 (EP,CN,US);
G06T3/14 (EP,US);
G06T7/60 (US);
H04N9/3179 (CN);
H04N9/3185 (EP,US);
H04N9/3194 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2018/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KALIBRIERUNG EINES ANZEIGEBILDES | [2018/52] | English: | PROJECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CALIBRATING DISPLAY IMAGE | [2018/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROJECTION ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE D'IMAGES AFFICHÉES | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 26.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008062164 (BASSI ZORAWAR [CA], et al) [X] 1-9,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0151] * * figures 1, 5, 7, 21 * [I] 10,11,14,15; | [A]US2008284987 (YONEZAWA RYOHICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0134] * * figures 1, 5, 8, 9 *; | [X]US2013235082 (FURUI SHIKI [JP]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 2-4, 6, 10 *; | [A] - Martin Von Gagern, "Computing a projective transformation", Mathematics Stack Exchange, (20160125), URL: https://math.stackexchange.com/q/339033, (20181112), XP055522780 [A] 1-15 * page 2 - page 4 * |