Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3428611
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2021 |
First examination report |
|
15.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.12.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
14.12.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.12.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
19.06.2018 |
Change - representative |
|