EP3402278 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Miho c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, Japan 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, Japan 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
SAEGUSA, Taiga c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, Japan 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
IWANE, Yasushi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, Japan 100-8310 / JP | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2018/46] | Application number, filing date | 18178528.8 | 28.01.2010 | [2018/46] | Priority number, date | JP20090021395 | 02.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009021395 | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3402278 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W36/00, H04W48/18, H04W56/00, H04W88/06, H04W72/08, // H04W4/08, H04W84/04 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
H04W4/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/541 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/0061 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W84/045 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2018/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, BASISSTATION UND BENUTZERAUSRÜSTUNG | [2018/46] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2018/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, STATION DE BASE ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2018/46] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 03.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 15.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10735644.6 / EP2393330 | Divisional application(s) | EP22156089.9 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008134281 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al); |