EP3422153 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVE SCANNING ON A BINOCULAR AUGMENTED REALITY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2019 | Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hand Held Products, Inc. 9680 Old Bailes Road Fort Mill, SC 29707 / US | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TODESCHINI, Erik HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 18178660.9 | 19.06.2018 | [2019/01] | Priority number, date | US201715632647 | 26.06.2017 Original published format: US201715632647 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422153 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/16, G06T19/00, G02B27/01 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
G06K7/10396 (CN);
G02B27/0093 (EP,CN,US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (CN);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
G06K7/1443 (US);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN ABTASTUNG AUF EINER BINOKULAREN VORRICHTUNG FÜR ERWEITERTE REALITÄT | [2019/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVE SCANNING ON A BINOCULAR AUGMENTED REALITY DEVICE | [2019/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE BALAYAGE SÉLECTIF SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE BINOCULAIRE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 16.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011001695 (SUZUKI KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] - [0 29] - [0035] - [0 39]; figures 1-6 * [I] 2-7,10,12-15; | [A]US2013346168 (ZHOU DYLAN T X [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0036] - [0 52] - [0056] - [0 77]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2015309316 (OSTERHOUT RALPH F [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0351] , [ 525] , [ 766] * | by applicant | US9443414 | US2016371884 |