EP3418962 - PUBLIC TRANSIT PAYMENT METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9 Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Kai Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. c/o Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68, Qinghe Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
CHAI, Along Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. c/o Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68, Qinghe Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Chengxin Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. c/o Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources, No. 68, Qinghe Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18179065.0 | 21.06.2018 | [2018/52] | Priority number, date | CN201710482717 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710482717 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3418962 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
G06Q20/351 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/28 (CN,US);
G06Q20/3224 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G06Q20/342 (CN,US);
G06Q20/349 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2018/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEZAHLUNG IM ÖFFENTLICHEN VERKEHR | [2018/52] | English: | PUBLIC TRANSIT PAYMENT METHOD AND DEVICE | [2018/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PAIEMENT DE TRANSIT PUBLIC | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 24.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.04.2022 | 19.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/37] | 09.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008208681 (HAMMAD AYMAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0068] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0099] - [0103] ** paragraphs [0107] , [0112] , [0121] , [0122] *; | [XI]US7562818 (BIERBAUM CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-12,15 * column 2, lines 7-34 * * column 3, line 7 - column 8, line 58 * * column 9, lines 24-39 * [I] 1-15 |