EP3399026 - REPROGRAMMING OF CELLS TO A NEW FATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Scripps Research Institute Mail Drop TPC-8 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla CA 92037 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Janghwan Samsung Pureun Apt. 113-1202 Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu 305727 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
ZHU, Saiyong 525 Nelson Rising Lane, Apt. 206 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 03 /
HILCOVE, Simon 4-1475 Laburnum Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6J 3W4 / CA | 04 /
DING, Sheng 6255 Silverbush Creek Street San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 05 /
EFE, Jem A. 14107 Brent Wilsey Place, 3 San Diego, CA 92128-6517 / US | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/26] |
Former [2018/45] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18179127.8 | 14.06.2011 | [2018/45] | Priority number, date | US20100354651P | 14.06.2010 Original published format: US 354651 P | US20100376148P | 23.08.2010 Original published format: US 376148 P | US201161437294P | 28.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161437294 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3399026 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3399026 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071, C12N5/0797, C12N5/0793, A61K35/30, A61K35/33, A61K35/34, C12N5/077, A61K35/39, C12N5/079, C12N5/074, C12N5/073, C12N15/85 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
C12N5/0676 (EP,US);
A61K35/30 (US);
A61K35/33 (US);
A61K35/34 (US);
A61K35/39 (US);
C12N15/85 (US);
C12N5/0602 (US);
C12N5/0603 (US);
C12N5/0607 (US);
C12N5/0618 (EP,US);
C12N5/0619 (US);
C12N5/0623 (EP,US);
C12N5/0657 (EP,US);
C12N5/0678 (EP,US);
C12N2501/01 (EP,US);
C12N2501/155 (EP,US);
C12N2501/235 (US);
C12N2501/602 (EP,US);
C12N2501/603 (EP,US);
C12N2501/604 (EP,US);
C12N2501/605 (US);
C12N2501/606 (EP,US);
C12N2501/727 (EP,US);
C12N2506/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] |
Former [2018/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUPROGRAMMIERUNG VON ZELLEN FÜR EIN NEUES ZELLSCHICKSAL | [2018/45] | English: | REPROGRAMMING OF CELLS TO A NEW FATE | [2018/45] | French: | REPROGRAMMATION DE CELLULES POUR LEUR CONFÉRER UN NOUVEAU DESTIN | [2018/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 07.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2023 | 23.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11796321.5 / EP2580320 | Divisional application(s) | EP24181335.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007161107 (MUMMERY CHRISTINE L [NL], et al); | [E]WO2011109695 (TEXAS HEART INST [US], et al); | by applicant | EP0566266 | US4252946 | US4352883 | US4353888 | US4431805 | US4536575 | US4628089 | US4900727 | DE3836676 | US4968733 | US4976859 | US5084350 | US5158881 | WO9220642 | WO9221660 | US5217999 | US5223503 | US5284761 | WO9403427 | US5302606 | WO9414808 | US5330992 | US5384253 | WO9505452 | WO9509852 | US5580859 | US5589466 | US5625031 | WO9720842 | WO9727297 | US5656610 | US5702932 | US5705350 | WO9805335 | US5733913 | US5733920 | US5736524 | US5776942 | US5780448 | US5789215 | WO9833798 | US5800828 | WO9839007 | US5821234 | US5849733 | US5858753 | US5882910 | US5945100 | US5981274 | US5985589 | US5994624 | WO0012485 | US6040321 | US6150359 | WO0144247 | WO0228861 | EP1199306 | US6452005 | US2002151554 | US6498163 | US6518277 | US6534476 | EP1295878 | US6569878 | US2003149001 | US2003203907 | US2003229026 | US2004048915 | US6730293 | US6756374 | US6800620 | WO2005084158 | US2005261317 | WO2006050351 | WO2007123667 | WO2008006583 | WO2008138834 | WO2008152394 | WO2008152390 | WO2008152387 | WO2009036082 | WO2009039140 | WO2009040552 | WO2009042607 | WO2009046448 | WO2009045175 | WO2009045174 | WO2009052145 | WO2009055418 | WO2009053715 | WO2009053716 | WO2009059030 | WO2009064802 | WO2009066084 | WO2009068482 | WO2009070524 | WO2009117439 | WO1998EP05559 |