|
09.07.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2024 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2024 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
21.11.2023 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
249 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2023 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2023 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
13.04.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
251 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
249 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
249 |
|
26.07.2022 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
248 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
248 |
|
04.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
04.11.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
04.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
248 |
|
07.07.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
248 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
248 |
|
29.01.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
248 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
227 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
226 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
214 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
114 |