EP3412750 - QUANTUM DOTS, PRODUCTION METHODS THEREOF, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Jihyun 5-1, Anam-ro 18ga-gil Dongdaemun-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
JANG, Eun Joo 23 Dongsuwon-ro 145beon-gill Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si 409-902 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yongwook 26, Yeongtong-ro 290beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 840-1602 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
PARK, Garam 8 Songi-ro 19-gil Songpa-gu 101-101 Seoul / KR | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Mullen, Lee Bryan Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18179312.6 | 27.10.2016 | [2018/50] | Priority number, date | KR20150150441 | 28.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150150441 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3412750 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, C09K11/66, H01L51/50, C09K11/88, G02F1/00, B82Y20/00, B82Y40/00, C09K11/61, H01L27/32, C08K3/16 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
C09K11/025 (EP,CN,US);
C09K11/664 (KR);
C09K11/88 (EP,CN,US);
B82Y20/00 (CN,US);
B82Y40/00 (CN,US);
C08K3/16 (US);
C09K11/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/0827 (KR);
C09K11/616 (EP,US);
C09K11/665 (EP,CN,US);
C09K11/881 (EP,US);
C09K11/883 (EP,US);
H01L33/26 (KR);
H05B33/14 (KR);
H10K50/115 (CN);
C08K2201/001 (US);
H10K2102/331 (EP,US);
H10K59/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2018/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | QUANTENPUNKTE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN DAMIT | [2018/50] | English: | QUANTUM DOTS, PRODUCTION METHODS THEREOF, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICES INCLUDING THE SAME | [2018/50] | French: | POINTS QUANTIQUES, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES LES COMPRENANT | [2018/50] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 12.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2019 | Observations by third parties | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16196124.8 / EP3168278 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013171517 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB]) [A] 1-18 * claims 12,13 * * "Examples" *; | [A]WO2015127494 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]) [A] 1-18 * claims 1,3,5-16 * * example 1 *; | [A] - DANDAN ZHANG ET AL, "Solution-Phase Synthesis of Cesium Lead Halide Perovskite Nanowires", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20150729), vol. 137, no. 29, doi:10.1021/jacs.5b05404, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 9230 - 9233, XP055241599 [A] 1-18 * page 3692, column 2 - page 3694, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jacs.5b05404 | [A] - LOREDANA PROTESESCU ET AL, "Nanocrystals of Cesium Lead Halide Perovskites (CsPbX 3 , X = Cl, Br, and I): Novel Optoelectronic Materials Showing Bright Emission with Wide Color Gamut", NANO LETTERS, US, (20150610), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1021/nl5048779, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 3692 - 3696, XP055241814 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl5048779 | by applicant | US6501091 | US7700200 | US2012001217 | US2013148376 | US8472758 | US8718437 | US8835941 | US9054329 | US9063363 | US2015362654 | US2016077269 | US9322979 | - R. D. SHANNON, "Revised effective ionic radii and systematic studies of interatomic distances in halides and chalcogenides", Acta Cryst, (19760000), vol. A32, pages 751 - 767, XP001085186 |