EP3399849 - COLD WORKED METAL HOUSING FOR A PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOBSON, Philip M. 315 Central Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
ZADESKY, Stephen P. 363 La Cuesta Drive Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | 03 /
TAN, Tang Yew 549 Kansas Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18179408.2 | 04.01.2008 | [2018/45] | Priority number, date | US200765006807 | 05.01.2007 Original published format: US 65006807 | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3399849 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/00, H04M1/02 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
H04M1/0252 (EP,KR,US);
H05K5/0213 (KR);
H05K5/0217 (US);
H05K5/0013 (EP,US);
H05K5/0018 (KR);
H05K5/0243 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | KALTGEWALZTES METALLGEHÄUSE FÜR EINE TRAGBARE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/45] | English: | COLD WORKED METAL HOUSING FOR A PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2018/45] | French: | BOÎTIER MÉTALLIQUE TRAVAILLÉ À FROID POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTABLE | [2018/45] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 22.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08713045.6 / EP2103200 | EP12198611.1 / EP2579698 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH07311286 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,8 * abstract *[I] 3,5-7,9-14; | [XI]US5574625 (OHGAMI KEIZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * column 5, line 16 - line 42; figures 1,2, 8 * [I] 3-7,9-14; | [XI]US5960332 (MICHALZIK DIRK [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 4, line 23 - line 47; figures 1, 2 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 60; figure 3 * [I] 3,5-7,10-14; | [XI]US2004203518 (ZHENG FEI [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,4-12 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,13,14 | by applicant | US5822192 | US6031524 | US2001024945 | JP2003013119 | US2004102208 |