EP3399096 - WATERMARK FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/45] | IMPROVEMENTS IN WATERMARKING | ||
[2022/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Portals Paper Limited Overton Mill Station Road Overton, Hampshire RG25 3JG / GB | [2021/15] |
Former [2018/45] | For all designated states Portals De La Rue Limited Overton Mill Station Road Overton Hampshire RG25 3ST / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Christian 33 Meadow Court Drive Oldland Common Bristol, South Gloucestershire BS30 9SU / GB | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/34] |
Former [2018/45] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 18179661.6 | 06.11.2015 | [2018/45] | Priority number, date | GB20140019956 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201419956 | GB20140019957 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201419957 | GB20140019960 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201419960 | GB20140019978 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201419978 | GB20140019986 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201419986 | GB20140019987 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: GB 201419987 | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3399096 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3399096 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/44 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
D21F1/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | AUSBILDUNG VON WASSERZEICHEN | [2022/11] | English: | WATERMARK FORMATION | [2022/11] | French: | FILIGRANAGE | [2022/11] |
Former [2018/45] | VERBESSERUNGEN BEI DER WASSERMARKIERUNG | ||
Former [2018/45] | IMPROVEMENTS IN WATERMARKING | ||
Former [2018/45] | AMÉLIORATIONS EN MATIÈRE DE FILIGRANAGE | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 29.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15794255.8 / EP3218545 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2022 | AT | 24.08.2022 | BG | 24.08.2022 | CY | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | MK | 24.08.2022 | MT | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | TR | 24.08.2022 | IE | 06.11.2022 | LU | 06.11.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
BG | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
TR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 06.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
TR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 06.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 06.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 06.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 06.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
IE | 06.11.2022 | ||
LU | 06.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 06.11.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102006058513 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,12-17,20 * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0025] , [0047] - [0053]; figure - *; | [X]WO2010036104 (VHP UGCHELEN BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12-17,19,20 * page 2, lines 5-10 * * page 7, line 35 - page 8, line 1 * * page 12, line 22 - page 14, line 1 ** figure - *; | [XP]EP2826915 (ARLEDTER HANS PETER [DE]) [XP] 1,2,4-8,11-20 * paragraphs [0022] , [0053] , [0066] , [0072]; figures 1,6-8 * |