EP3450937 - SPECTROMETRIC MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYSING A MEDIUM USING A SPECTROMETRIC MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH P.O. Box 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermersdorf, Marion Unterer Stichweg 10 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
Noltemeyer, Ralf Wengertweg 19 71083 Herrenberg / DE | 03 /
Husnik, Martin Hasenbergstrasse 88 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Michel, Florian Grafinger Str. 7 85665 Moosach / DE | 05 /
Stein, Benedikt Hauptmannsreute 164 70193 Stuttgart / DE | 06 /
Schelling, Christoph Schafgaerten 23 70619 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 18180029.3 | 27.06.2018 | [2019/10] | Priority number, date | DE201710213865 | 09.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017213865 | [2019/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3450937 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3450937 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/12, B01L9/00, G01N21/03 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
G01J3/0202 (EP);
G01N21/255 (CN);
G01J3/0205 (EP);
G01J3/0208 (EP);
G01J3/021 (EP);
G01J3/0237 (EP);
G01J3/0256 (EP);
G01J3/0272 (EP);
G01J3/0291 (EP);
G01J3/12 (EP);
G01N21/031 (EP);
G01N21/27 (CN);
G01N21/31 (EP);
G01N2021/0314 (EP);
G01N21/90 (EP);
G01N2201/0634 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEKTROMETRISCHE MESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE EINES MEDIUMS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER SPEKTROMETRISCHEN MESSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/10] | English: | SPECTROMETRIC MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYSING A MEDIUM USING A SPECTROMETRIC MEASURING DEVICE | [2019/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE SPECTROMÉTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'UN MILIEU AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE SPECTROMÉTRIQUE | [2019/10] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 15.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE19751403 (OPTOSENS OPTISCHE SPEKTROSKOPI [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,12,13,15 * column 4, line 24 - column 6, line 54 * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 45 * * figures 1, 4 * * column 12, line 58 - line 62 * [Y] 6-8,14 [I] 4,10,11; | [Y]DE102006003672 (STICHT FERTIGUNGSTECH STIWA [AT]) [Y] 6-8,14 * paragraphs [0080] , [0 81] ** figure 19 *; | [XYI]WO2010027982 (MICROPTIX TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-13,15 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 1, 4-9 * [Y] 6-8,14 [I] 10; | [Y]CN106731910 (SHENZHEN INST OF ADV TECH CAS, et al) [Y] 6-8,14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5909280 |