EP3422469 - METHOD FOR AIMING AN ACTIVE ANTENNA, ASSOCIATED CONTROL DEVICE AND ACTIVE ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES TOUR CARPE DIEM Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIVAT, Eric Thales Communications & Security S.A.S. 4, avenue des Louvresses 92622 GENNEVILLIERS CEDEX / FR | 02 /
TOURET, Marc Thales Communications & Security S.A.S. 4 Avenue des Louvresses 92622 GENNEVILLIERS CEDEX / FR | 03 /
HAMMOUDI, Mehdi Thales Communications & Security S.A.S. 4, avenue des Louvresses 92622 GENNEVILLIERS CEDEX / FR | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 18180195.2 | 27.06.2018 | [2019/01] | Priority number, date | FR20170000688 | 27.06.2017 Original published format: FR 1700688 | [2019/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422469 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3422469 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12, H01Q3/08, H01Q3/26 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
H01Q3/08 (EP);
H01Q1/1257 (EP);
H01Q3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2019/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN EINER AKTIVEN ANTENNE, ENTSPRECHENDE STEUERVORRICHTUNG UND AKTIVE ANTENNE | [2019/01] | English: | METHOD FOR AIMING AN ACTIVE ANTENNA, ASSOCIATED CONTROL DEVICE AND ACTIVE ANTENNA | [2019/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE POINTAGE D'UNE ANTENNE ACTIVE, DISPOSITIF DE PILOTAGE ASSOCIÉ ET ANTENNE ACTIVE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 04.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
GR | 06.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US4881078 (YAMANE TOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [I] 1,3,6-8,11-13 * figure all * * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 40 - column 6, line 3 * [A] 2,4,5,9,10; | [A]WO9715092 (NIELSEN PETER [DK]) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 * * figures 1-5 * * page 4, line 8 - line 23 * * page 4, line 35 - page 6, line 4 * * page 9, line 4 - page 11, line 11 * * page 14, line 11 - line 21 * * page 16, line 10 - line 24 ** page 17, line 29 - page 18, line 31 *; | [IA]US6400315 (ADLER CHARLES OTIS [US], et al) [I] 1,3,6-8,11-13 * column 1, line 7 - line 15 * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 15 * * figures 2,4 * * claims 1-9 * [A] 2,4,5,9,10; | [A]US2005093743 (PARK UNG-HEE [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] * |