EP3422061 - CABLE ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mellanox Technologies, Ltd. Hakidma St 26 Ofer Industrial Park 2069200 Yokneam / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2024/09] | For all designated states Mellanox Technologies, Ltd. Hakidma St 26, Ofer Industrial Park 2069200 Yokneam / IL | ||
Former [2019/01] | For all designated states Mellanox Technologies, Ltd. Hakidama 26, Ofer Industrial Park 2069200 Yokneam / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZAV, Yaniv c/o Mellanox Technologies, Ltd. Hakidama 26 Ofer Industrial Park 2069200 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
GER, Andrey 8 Harakun St. 5232238 Ramat Gan / IL | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/09] |
Former [2019/01] | Kramer, Dani Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18180210.9 | 27.06.2018 | [2019/01] | Priority number, date | US201715635236 | 28.06.2017 Original published format: US201715635236 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422061 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3422061 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, H01R31/06, H04B1/38, H05K1/02, H05K1/14, H05K9/00, H01R12/72, H01R33/88, H01R33/94 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/4284 (EP,US);
H01R31/06 (EP,CN,US);
H01R33/94 (US);
G02B6/4201 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
G02B6/4261 (EP,US);
G02B6/4269 (US);
G02B6/4274 (EP,US);
H01R33/88 (US);
H04B1/38 (US);
H05K7/20 (CN);
G02B6/426 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] |
Former [2019/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KABELADAPTER | [2019/01] | English: | CABLE ADAPTER | [2019/01] | French: | ADAPTATEUR DE CÂBLE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 17.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6816376 (BRIGHT EDWARD JOHN [US], et al) [A] 2,3,9,10 * figure 1 *; | [YD]US2011081807 (REPHAELI SHAI [IL], et al) [YD] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] *; | [A]US8419444 (KAGAN MICHAEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [Y]US2015092363 (BLIER MICHEL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031] - [0034] , [0036] , [0049] - [0050]; figures 10-12 *; | [A]US2015282382 (NGUYEN LONG VAN [US]) [A] 2-4,9-11 * paragraph [0043]; figures 1b,5 *; | [A]CN205846322U (WENZHOU YIHUA CONNECTOR CO LTD) [A] 2,3,9,10 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A] - Osfpmsa, "OSFPMSA", (20170515), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170515163648/https://www.osfpmsa.org/index.html, (20181026), XP055519552 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | US2013251052 | US2013323963 | by applicant | US7934959 |