EP3588472 - IMPROVED REAL TIME SPORTS MOTION TRAINING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states West & Berg Holding AB c/o Finanshuset Krankajen 14 211 12 Malmö / SE | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDGÅRD, Fredrik Rudeboksvägen 38 226 55 LUND / SE | 02 /
NILSSON, Johan Esarpsvägen 330-72 245 91 STAFFANSTORP / SE | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/01] | 01 /
REDGÅRD, Fredrik Rudeboksvägen 38 226 55 Lund Sweden 226 55 LUND / SE | ||
02 /
NILSSON, Johan Esarpsvägen 330-72 245 91 STAFFANSTORP / SE | Representative(s) | Hansson Thyresson AB PO Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18180488.1 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3588472 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3588472 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G09B19/00, A63B24/00 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G09B19/0038 (EP,US);
A63B69/3608 (US);
A63B24/0006 (US);
A63B69/3632 (US);
A63B2024/0015 (US);
A63B2220/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] |
Former [2020/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ECHTZEIT-SPORTBEWEGUNGSTRAININGSHILFE | [2020/01] | English: | IMPROVED REAL TIME SPORTS MOTION TRAINING AID | [2020/01] | French: | AIDE À L'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE MOUVEMENTS SPORTIFS EN TEMPS RÉEL AMÉLIORÉE | [2020/01] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 03.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2022 | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | LU | 28.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 28.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
PT | 28.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006084516 (EYESTONE RICHARD D [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0070] - paragraphs [0071] , [0079]; figures 1-17 * * paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0194] * * paragraphs [0136] , [0143] *; | [A]US2012259578 (BEVILACQUA MATHEW W [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0022] , [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figures 2, 3A *; | [A]US2013128022 (BOSE BHASKAR [US], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0181] *; | [A]EP3252736 (WEST & BERGH IT CONSULTING AB [SE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | by applicant | WO03024544 | US6778866 | WO2005018759 | - MAHONY, IEEE Transactions on automatic control, (20080600), vol. 53, no. 5, page 1203 |