Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11049646 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2021 | B2 | US2019006092 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017127601 | 29.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6599933B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2019 | B2 | JP2019012894 | 24.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017127601 | 29.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109215958 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017127601 | 29.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3428938 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2020 | B1 | EP3428938 | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017127601 | 29.06.2017 |