EP3413407 - CONTROLLED-IMPEDANCE CABLE TERMINATION USING COMPLIANT INTERCONNECT ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ardent Concepts Inc. 4 Merrill Industrial Drive, Suite 102 Hampton, NH 03842 / US | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINTHER, Gordon, A. 130 Ledge Road Unit 2 Seabrook, NH 03874 / US | 02 /
DIAZ, Sergio 229 Putnam Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
HEBERT, Jeffrey, G. 9 Village Brook Lane Derry, NH 03038 / US | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Franke, Dirk Franke & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstraße 25 80538 München / DE | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 18181450.0 | 24.10.2012 | [2018/50] | Priority number, date | US201161550543P | 24.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161550543 P | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413407 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3413407 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/648, H01R12/51, H01R9/03, H01R13/24, H01R24/38, H01R12/75, H01R43/00, H01R13/6473, H01R13/6591, // H01R12/71, H01R12/79, H01R13/66 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
H01R12/75 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01R12/714 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01R13/65912 (EP,CN,US);
H02G1/14 (KR,US);
H01R12/79 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/2421 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01R13/6473 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/648 (KR);
H01R13/6581 (KR);
H01R13/6633 (EP,KR,US);
H01R24/38 (KR,US);
H01R43/00 (KR,US);
Y10T29/53243 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | H01R13/648, H01R12/51, H01R9/03, H01R13/24, H01R24/38, H01R12/75, H01R43/00, H01R13/6473, // H01R12/71, H01R12/79, H01R13/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2018/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KABELABSCHLUSS MIT KONTROLLIERTER IMPEDANZ MIT FLEXIBLEN VERBINDUNGSELEMENTEN | [2018/50] | English: | CONTROLLED-IMPEDANCE CABLE TERMINATION USING COMPLIANT INTERCONNECT ELEMENTS | [2018/50] | French: | EXTRÉMITÉ DE CÂBLE À IMPÉDANCE CONTRÔLÉE UTILISANT DES ÉLÉMENTS D'INTERCONNEXION CONFORMES | [2018/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 12.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12843021.2 / EP2771948 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2002050388 (SIMPSON JEFFREY S [US]) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1-7B * [Y] 2 [I] 3-6; | [A]US2004200633 (VINTHER GORDON A [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** figures 1-20 *; | [Y]US2005208828 (MILLER WILL A [US], et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009023333 (SOUBH EMAD [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-5B * | by applicant | US7126062 | US7544093 | USRE41663E |