EP3476278 - ILLUSTRATING ERROR IN A LOCAL ACTIVATION TIME DISTRIBUTION MAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATZ, Natan Sharon c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd: P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
ZAR, Lior c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd: P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 03 /
COHEN, Benjamin c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd: P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 18181527.5 | 18.10.2016 | [2019/18] | Priority number, date | US201514886910 | 19.10.2015 Original published format: US201514886910 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3476278 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/015 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/743 (CN,IL,US);
A61B5/01 (CN);
A61B5/7221 (IL,US);
A61B5/7275 (IL,US);
G01K13/20 (EP,US);
G01K15/007 (EP,IL,US);
G01N25/18 (IL);
A61B2018/00029 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00357 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00797 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2218/002 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2560/0276 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERANSCHAULICHUNG VON FEHLERN BEI EINER KARTE VON LOKALEN AKTIVIERUNGSZEITEN | [2019/18] | English: | ILLUSTRATING ERROR IN A LOCAL ACTIVATION TIME DISTRIBUTION MAP | [2019/18] | French: | ILLUSTRATION D'ERREUR DANS UNE CARTE DE DISTRIBUTION DE DURÉE D'ACTIVATION LOCALE | [2019/18] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16194397.2 / EP3158925 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | by applicant | US2009306650 | US2011130648 | US2014171821 | US8986217 | US2015112149 |