EP3590916 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF DIALKYL DICARBONATES WITH QUATERNARY AMMONIUM CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [2020/50] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Christoph Lanxess Deutschland GmbH Semmelweisstr. 15 51061 Köln / DE | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 18181804.8 | 05.07.2018 | [2020/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3590916 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C68/02, C07C69/96 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
C07C68/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/02, C07C69/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIALKYLDICARBONATEN MIT QUATERNÄREN AMMONIUMKATALYSATOREN | [2020/02] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF DIALKYL DICARBONATES WITH QUATERNARY AMMONIUM CATALYSTS | [2020/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BICARBONATES DE DIALKYLE AU MOYEN DE CATALYSEURS À L'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE | [2020/02] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 14.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1210853 (BAYER AG) [AD] 1-15 * example 6i; claim - *; | [XI]EP0657414 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-13 * the whole document * [I] 5-7,14,15; | [A] - DANIEL PLUSQUELLEC ET AL, "A NEW SYNTHESIS OF CARBOXYLIC AND CARBONIC ACID ANHYDRIDES USING PHASE TRANSFER REACTIONS", TETRAHEDRON, (19880101), vol. 44, pages 2471 - 2476, XP055532555 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE1210853 | DE1418849 |