EP3424881 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AEROGELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interbran Systems AG Karl-Lösch-Straße 2 67360 Lingenfeld / DE | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜMCHEN, Prof. (Ro) Dr. H. C. Kurt Bahnhofstrasse 39 53949 Dahlem / DE | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 18181927.7 | 10.09.2015 | [2019/02] | Priority number, date | DE20141014377 | 02.10.2014 Original published format: DE102014014377 | DE201410117759 | 03.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014117759 | [2019/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424881 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/158, C01B33/16, G02F1/1335, G02F1/13363 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C01B33/1585 (EP,US);
C01B33/1435 (EP,US);
C01B33/1546 (EP,US);
C01B33/16 (EP,US);
G02F1/133502 (EP,US);
G02F1/133634 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AEROGELEN | [2019/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AEROGELS | [2019/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'AÉROGELS | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 09.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15771521.0 / EP3201132 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20120070948 ; | [XI]KR20110125773 ; | [XI]CN102765725 ; | [XAI]US2008316404 (YAMAKI TAKEYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0137] - [0152] * * the whole document * [A] 15[I] 2-14; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 11, Database accession no. 2012-H93967, XP002785381 & KR20120070948 A 20120702 (FINETEC CORP) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * Zitate beziehen sich auf die Maschinenübersetzung ins Englische. * * the whole document * | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 08, Database accession no. 2011-P71418, XP002750852 & KR20110125773 A 20111122 (FINETEC CORP) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * Zitate beziehen sich auf die Manschinenübersetzung ins Englische; paragraph [0002] * * the whole document * [I] 2-14 | [XI] - RAO A V ET AL, "Comparative studies on the surface chemical modification of silica aerogels based on various organosilane compounds of the type RnSiX4-n", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041215), vol. 350, doi:10.1016/J.JNONCRYSOL.2004.06.034, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 216 - 223, XP004905662 [X] 1,15 * 2.1. Sample Preparation; page 2, column r * * the whole document * [I] 2-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jnoncrysol.2004.06.034 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 70, Database accession no. 2013-B97061, XP002754656 & CN102765725 A 20121107 (BLUE SMOKE BEIJING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * the whole document * * Zitate beziehen sich auf die Englische Machinenübersetzung. * [I] 2-14 | by applicant | DE1953833 | EP0171722 | DE19541992 | DE19648798 | DE19752456 |