EP3427676 - ORTHOPAEDIC REAMER CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symmetry Medical Manufacturing, Inc. 3724 N. State Road 15 Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEEKES, Stuart 73 Courtland Road Oxford, OX44HZ / GB | 02 /
TRUSCOTT, James 66 Grange Drive Swindon, SN34LD / GB | 03 /
KERBOUL, Guillaume 2 Swan Close Crudwell, SN169DE / GB | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 18181996.2 | 05.07.2018 | [2019/03] | Priority number, date | US201715648642 | 13.07.2017 Original published format: US201715648642 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427676 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/162 (EP);
A61B17/1659 (EP);
A61B17/1666 (EP);
A61B17/1684 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDER FÜR ORTHOPÄDISCHE REIBAHLE | [2019/03] | English: | ORTHOPAEDIC REAMER CONNECTOR | [2019/03] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR FRAISE ORTHOPÉDIQUE | [2019/03] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 12.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003216716 (DESARZENS YVES [CH]); | [A]WO2010004267 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al); | [X]EP3023063 (SYMMETRY MEDICAL INC [US]) | by applicant | US5658290 | US6854742 | US7115119 |