EP3425680 - ROAD SURFACE POWER GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Apollo Ding Rong Solar Technology Co., Ltd. Room 3001 No. 6 Building No. 7 Rong Chang East Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yunfang Room 3001, No. 6 Building, No. 7 Rong Chang East Street, Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing, Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Fengyu Room 3001, No. 6 Building, No. 7 Rong Chang East Street, Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing, Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
HUO, Yanyin Room 3001, No. 6 Building, No. 7 Rong Chang East Street, Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing, Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
CAO, Zhifeng Room 3001, No. 6 Building, No. 7 Rong Chang East Street, Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing, Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Branca, Emanuela, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 18182018.4 | 05.07.2018 | [2019/02] | Priority number, date | CN201710546849 | 06.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710546849 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425680 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/048, H02S40/12 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H02S20/21 (EP,US);
H02S30/00 (KR);
H02S40/40 (EP,CN,US);
E01C1/002 (US);
E01C11/00 (US);
E01C11/24 (US);
E01C11/265 (US);
E01F11/00 (US);
H01L31/02366 (US);
H01L31/042 (KR);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
H01L31/0488 (CN);
H02S20/10 (EP,US);
H02S40/12 (EP,US);
H02S40/44 (KR);
H02S50/00 (KR);
H05B3/84 (KR);
H05B2214/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRBAHNSTROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/02] | English: | ROAD SURFACE POWER GENERATION SYSTEM | [2019/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE DE SURFACE DE ROUTE | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 27.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 01.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005199282 (OLEINICK JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0072]; figure 7B *; | [X]US8907202 (BRUSAW SCOTT DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * columns 7-11; figures 4-5 *; | [XAI]CN205917555U (NANJING QIANQIUYE DECORATION ENG CO LTD) [X] 1,6,7,10 * the whole document * [A] 9 [I] 3; | [XI]CN106679208 (UNIV SOUTHWEST JIAOTONG) [X] 1 * figure 2 *[I] 8 |