EP3590436 - IDENTIFYING AN OPTIMAL IMAGE FROM A NUMBER OF ULTRASOUND IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULMAN, Shrutin c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SANTHANA NAIDU, Navaneetha Krishnan c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KRISHNAMURTHY, Girish c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 18182191.9 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3590436 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
A61B8/5223 (EP);
A61B8/0866 (EP,US);
A61B8/4236 (US);
A61B8/5246 (EP);
A61B8/5292 (EP,US);
G06T5/40 (US);
G06T7/0014 (US);
G16H30/20 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES OPTIMALEN BILDES AUS EINER REIHE VON ULTRASCHALLBILDERN | [2020/02] | English: | IDENTIFYING AN OPTIMAL IMAGE FROM A NUMBER OF ULTRASOUND IMAGES | [2020/02] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'UNE IMAGE OPTIMALE À PARTIR D'UN CERTAIN NOMBRE D'IMAGES ULTRASONORES | [2020/02] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010217123 (ERAN AHARON [IL], et al); | [XA]US2012232394 (TOJI BUNPEI [JP]); | [A]US2017367685 (ZOU YAOXIAN [CN], et al) | by applicant | US2006100521 | US2011196235 | US2017360412 |