EP3404452 - PROJECTION TYPE IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURASHIGE, Makio c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Kazutoshi c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
TAKANOKURA, Tomoe c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | 04 /
OYAGI, Yasuyuki c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co. Ltd. 1-1 Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo, 162-8001 / JP | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18182384.0 | 07.09.2010 | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3404452 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3404452 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/02, G02B3/00, G02B5/32, G03H1/00, G03H1/22, G03H1/32, G02B27/48, G03B21/20, G03B33/06, H04N9/31 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
G02B27/48 (EP,CN,US);
G03B21/14 (KR);
G03B21/2033 (EP,CN,US);
G02B3/0006 (US);
G02B5/0252 (EP,CN,US);
G02B5/32 (EP,CN,US);
G03B21/208 (EP,CN,US);
G03B33/06 (EP,CN,US);
G03H1/0005 (EP,CN,US);
G03H1/22 (EP,CN,US);
G03H1/2286 (EP,CN,US);
G03H1/32 (EP,CN,US);
H04N9/31 (US);
H04N9/3129 (EP,CN,US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] |
Former [2018/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSTYPBILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2020/20] | English: | PROJECTION TYPE IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2018/47] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE DE TYPE À PROJECTION ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2020/20] |
Former [2018/47] | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG VOM PROJEKTIONSTYP | ||
Former [2018/47] | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES PAR PROJECTION | Examination procedure | 20.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 20.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10857012.8 / EP2615494 | EP16179984.6 / EP3104222 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2010 | AL | 28.10.2020 | AT | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | DK | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | ES | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | IT | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MK | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | SE | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | NO | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 07.09.2010 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007085978 (YAMAUCHI TAISUKE [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-10 *; | [XI]US2008247022 (YAMAUCHI TAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0142]; figures 10-11 * [I] 2-8,10,11; | [XI]US2009168424 (YAMAUCHI TAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0112]; figures 8-9 * [I] 2-8,10,11; | [A]US2009168134 (NOJIMA SHIGEO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0097]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2010020291 (KASAZUMI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0232]; figures 1-30 * | by applicant | JPH06208089 | JP2849021B | JP2004144936 | JP2004264512 |