EP3428658 - PROBE ATTENUATOR FOR REDUCED INPUT CAPACITANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tektronix, Inc. 14150 SW Karl Braun Drive P.O. Box 500, M/S 50-LAW Beaverton, OR 97077-0001 / US | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANDY, Jonathan Beaverton, OR 97077-0001 / US | [2024/39] |
Former [2019/03] | 01 /
DANDY, Jonathan 12740 SW Park Way Portland, Oregon 97225 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/39] |
Former [2019/03] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18182476.4 | 09.07.2018 | [2019/03] | Priority number, date | US201762530759P | 10.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762530759 P | US201715842654 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: US201715842654 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428658 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3428658 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/067, G01R35/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G01R1/06766 (EP,CN,US);
G01R1/06772 (EP,CN,US);
G01R1/44 (US);
G01R35/00 (EP,US);
G01R35/005 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SONDENDÄMPFER FÜR REDUZIERTE EINGANGSKAPAZITÄT | [2019/03] | English: | PROBE ATTENUATOR FOR REDUCED INPUT CAPACITANCE | [2019/03] | French: | ATTÉNUATEUR DE SONDE POUR CAPACITÉ D'ENTRÉE RÉDUITE | [2019/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 16.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE2704002 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [I]JPH06331657 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2009145172 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2010121956 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [I]CN103364599 (RIGOL TECHNOLOGIES INC) |