EP3421948 - SYSTEM FOR GAS DISTRIBUTION AND MASS FLOW MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEORAN, Yogendra Yogi Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
FACINELLI, William Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
KANG, Alan Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 04 /
EARL, Andrew Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 05 /
ISOBE, Jun Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 18182670.2 | 29.01.2016 | [2019/01] | Priority number, date | US201514611448 | 02.02.2015 Original published format: US201514611448 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421948 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3421948 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/684, G01F15/00, F16K37/00, F16K1/22, G05D7/06 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
G01F1/6842 (EP,US);
F16K1/22 (US);
F16K1/221 (EP,US);
F16K37/005 (EP,US);
G01F1/69 (US);
G01F1/86 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/01] | G01F1/684, G01F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Title | German: | GASVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM UND MASSENSTROMMESSUNG | [2019/01] | English: | SYSTEM FOR GAS DISTRIBUTION AND MASS FLOW MEASUREMENT | [2019/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE GAZ ET DE MESURE DE DÉBIT MASSIQUE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 18.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16153442.5 / EP3051193 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2016 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | ES | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | IT | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | MT | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SE | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | IE | 29.01.2021 | LU | 29.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | FR | 27.03.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 29.01.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 29.01.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005262937 (EMMERT CHARLES G JR [US], et al) [A] 4,7,8* paragraphs [0002] , [0030] , [0 33] - [0034]; figures 2, 5 *; | [A]US2011048564 (WIBLE ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0008] - [0011] - [0023] - [0031]; figures 1, 2 *; | [XAI]WO2012012769 (FLUID COMPONENTS INTERNAT LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 11 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 6; figures 2, 9 * [A] 5,11 [I] 2,6,10; | [A]EP1264160 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 10,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0010] - [0011]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2014075905 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 23 - page 7, line 9; figure 1 * |