Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102455253B | Global Dossier | 14.10.2022 | B1 | KR20190072199 | 25.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170173363 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102455250B | Global Dossier | 14.10.2022 | B1 | KR20190072198 | 25.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170173362 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102451516B | Global Dossier | 05.10.2022 | B1 | KR20190072197 | 25.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170173361 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101895522B | Global Dossier | 04.10.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170173359 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113257142B | Global Dossier | 02.05.2023 | B | CN113257142 | 13.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170173359 | 15.12.2017 | CN202110591263 | 19.07.2018 | KR20170173362 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173363 | 15.12.2017 | CN201810794673 | 19.07.2018 | KR20170173361 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10653021 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2020 | B2 | US2019191574 | 20.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170173359 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173362 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173363 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173361 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109935167B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2021 | B | CN109935167 | 25.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170173359 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173362 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173363 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173361 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3499052 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2021 | B1 | EP3499052 | 19.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170173359 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173362 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173363 | 15.12.2017 | KR20170173361 | 15.12.2017 |