EP3594011 - SECURE COLD STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Youniqx Identity AG Tenschertstrasse 7 1230 Vienna / AT | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOFLER, Robert c/o youniqx Identity AG Tenschertstraße 7 1230 Vienna / AT | 02 /
STEINDL, Franz c/o youniqx Identity AG Tenschertstraße 7 1230 Vienna / AT | 03 /
HARRINGER, Stefan c/o youniqx Identity AG Tenschertstraße 7 1230 Vienna / AT | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 18182991.2 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594011 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/29, H04L9/32, // G06Q20/06, G06Q20/38, G06K7/14, G06K19/10 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
H04L9/3247 (EP);
B42D15/025 (EP);
B42D25/305 (EP);
G06Q20/065 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/346 (EP);
G06Q20/3825 (EP);
G06Q20/3829 (EP);
G07F7/0866 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERES KÜHLMEDIUM | [2020/03] | English: | SECURE COLD STORAGE MEDIUM | [2020/03] | French: | MOYEN DE STOCKAGE À FROID SÉCURISÉ | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2017028828 (SOBOTKA PETR [CZ]) [X] 1-6,8-10 * page 2, lines 10-15, 17-24 * * page 3, lines 16-18 * * page 4, lines 5-11,13-16,17-22 * * page 5, lines 16-23 * * page 6, lines 1-12,15-16 * * page 10, lines 18-24 * * page 11, lines 1-7 * * page 12, lines 21-23 * * page 13, lines 1-5 * * page 16, lines 22-23 * * page 17, lines 2-9 * * page 18, lines 5-8 * * page 21, lines 20-21 * * page 22, lines 1-2 * * page 24, lines 1,6-13 * * page 26, lines 1-5 * [I] 7; | [I] - Anonymous, "Bitcoin Certificates - "A bitcoin in your pocket"", (20161021), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20161021140118if_/https://www.bitcoinsuisse.ch/assets/pdf/BTCS_BitcoinCertificates_EN.pdf, (20181115), XP055524162 [I] 1-10 * page 2, lines 12-14,24-27 * * page 3, lines 1-7, 27,28,33-36,39-42 * * page 6, lines 15-21,25-27 * |