EP3594655 - ELECTRONIC STERILISABLE PIPETTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INFYS sprl rue du Marais 7 6150 Anderlues / BE | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El-Fajjouchi, Billal rue Nouvelle 23 6010 Couillet / BE | 02 /
Baran, Ismail rue du Marais 7 6150 Anderlues / BE | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | ABYOO Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18183004.3 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594655 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/14, B01L3/02, G01N35/10 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
G01N1/14 (EP);
B01L3/0213 (EP);
G01N35/1004 (EP);
B01L2200/04 (EP);
B01L2200/141 (EP);
B01L2400/0487 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE STERILISIERBARE PIPETTIERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/03] | English: | ELECTRONIC STERILISABLE PIPETTING DEVICE | [2020/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PIPETAGE STÉRILISABLE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 29.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US4779467 (RAININ KENNETH [US], et al) [I] 1,14 * column 4, line 5 - column 7, line 30; figures 1-3 * [A] 8,15 [Y] 2-7,9-13; | [A]GB2282883 (MANOSTAT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 20 - page 15, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2163892 (HACH LANGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [YA] - Sartorius Global, "eLINE Electronic Pipette", (20161129), URL: https://www.sartoriusglobal.com/_ui/images/h0e/hfc/8843377770526.pdf, (20190118), XP055544890 [Y] 2-7,9-13 * 11.2 Cleaning and Autoclaving the Lower Part of Pipettes; page 30 - page 32 * * Battery Replacement; page 33 * [A] 1,8,14,15 | by applicant | US2008184823 | US5509318 | EP1531004 | WO2009067834 | US2009117009 |