EP3594527 - SHOCK ABSORBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Öhlins Racing AB Box 722 194 27 Upplands Väsby / SE | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sintorn, Torkel Hallmans allé 1, Skarpö 185 91 Vaxholm / SE | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 665 831 27 Östersund / SE | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18183430.0 | 13.07.2018 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594527 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/06, F16F9/092 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
F16F9/092 (EP,US);
F16F9/063 (EP,US);
F16F9/36 (US);
B62K25/06 (US);
F16F2222/126 (US);
F16F2224/025 (US);
F16F2230/0023 (US);
F16F2230/30 (US);
F16F2232/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] |
Former [2020/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOSSDÄMPFER | [2020/03] | English: | SHOCK ABSORBER | [2020/03] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE CHOCS | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3222049 (FRANZ TUCZEK) [X] 1,9,10,12,15 * figure 1 * [A] 2-8,11,13,14; | [XAI]FR1535463 (COLMERAUER PAUL) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - line 5; figure 1 * [A] 9-15 [I] 3,4,7; | [A]US4132395 (FOX JR ROBERT C) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]US2015290993 (DILLMAN PATRICK S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0048]; figure 4 * |