EP3432518 - REMOTE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND CIRCUITRY FOR MOBILE BROADBAND ROUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZyXEL Communications Corporation 11F., No.223, Sec. 3, Beixin Rd. Xindian Dist. 231 New Taipei City / TW | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YI, Chih-Tsao No.6 Innovation Road II, Hsinchu Science Park 300 Hsinchu / TW | 02 /
CHANG, Tang-Po 11F., No. 223, Sec. 3, Beixin Rd. , Xindian Dist 23143 New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
CHEN, Hui-San 11F., No. 223, Sec. 3, Beixin Rd. , Xindian Dist 23143 New Taipei City / TW | 04 /
HSU, Jui-Wen 11F., No. 223, Sec. 3, Beixin Rd. , Xindian Dist 23143 New Taipei City / TW | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 18183632.1 | 16.07.2018 | [2019/04] | Priority number, date | CN201710586011 | 18.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710586011 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432518 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3432518 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/16, H04L41/28, H04L41/0803, H04W24/02 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H04L41/0803 (EP);
H04L45/745 (CN);
H04L41/28 (EP,CN);
H04L49/30 (CN);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04L12/462 (CN);
H04L45/60 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | H04L12/24, H04W88/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] |
Former [2019/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR FERNVERWALTUNG EINES MOBILEN BREITBANDROUTERS | [2019/04] | English: | REMOTE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND CIRCUITRY FOR MOBILE BROADBAND ROUTER | [2019/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET CIRCUITS DE GESTION À DISTANCE POUR ROUTEUR MOBILE À LARGE BANDE | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 19.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | IE | 16.07.2023 | LU | 16.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
IT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004125762 (HALLER AMIT [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,12-14 * paragraph [0008] * * the whole document *[A] 1-4,8-11; | [XYI] - Anonymous, "3G27WV-02 21Mbps Mobile Broadband Router with Voice USER GUIDE", (20151001), URL: https://support.netcommwireless.com/sites/default/files/3G27WV-02-User-Guide.pdf, (20181115), XP055524349 [X] 1,4,8,11 * Pages 1, 6, 21, 35, 49 * [Y] 5-7,12-14 [I] 2,3,9,10 |