EP3461091 - TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR NETWORK MANAGEMENT CONTROL INFORMATION AND MICROWAVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/13] | TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR NETWORK MANAGEMENT CONTROL INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD AND MICROWAVE DEVICE | ||
[2021/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Kun Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Yi Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LONG, Hao Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 18183947.3 | 31.12.2013 | [2019/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3461091 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/02, H04L27/18, H04B7/24 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
H04L27/02 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04L27/04 (US);
H04L27/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON NETZVERWALTUNGSSTEUERUNGSINFORMATIONEN UND MIKROWELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2019/13] | English: | TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR NETWORK MANAGEMENT CONTROL INFORMATION AND MICROWAVE DEVICE | [2021/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE POUR GESTION DE RÉSEAU, ET DISPOSITIF À MICRO-ONDES | [2021/26] |
Former [2019/13] | TRANSMISSION METHOD FOR NETWORK MANAGEMENT CONTROL INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD AND MICROWAVE DEVICE | ||
Former [2019/13] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION POUR GESTION DE RÉSEAU, PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF À MICRO-ONDES | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 26.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13900758.7 / EP3079270 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101697500 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-15* figure 7 * |