EP3459660 - ADAPTOR FOR HOLDING A TOOL IN A COLLET CHUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Haimer Maschinenbau KG Weiherstrasse 21 86568 Hollenbach-Igenhausen / DE | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAIMER, Franz Weiherstraße 21 86568 Igenhausen / DE | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18184137.0 | 18.07.2018 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | DE201710120235 | 04.09.2017 Original published format: DE102017120235 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459660 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/11, // B23B31/20 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
B23B31/20125 (EP,US);
B23B31/102 (US);
B23B31/06 (US);
B23B31/11 (EP,US);
B23B2231/02 (US);
B23B2231/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTER ZUR HALTERUNG EINES WERKZEUGS IN EINEM SPANNZANGENFUTTER | [2019/13] | English: | ADAPTOR FOR HOLDING A TOOL IN A COLLET CHUCK | [2019/13] | French: | ADAPTATEUR DE MAINTENU D'UN OUTIL DANS UN MANDRIN À PINCE DE SERRAGE | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 27.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB770207 (JOHN MCGREGOR) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3719367 (BATURKA W) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [X]EP0423425 (GILDEMEISTER SPA [IT]) [X] 13 * figure - *; | [A]US2007231094 (GUY HANOCH [IL]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XA]DE202008014738U (REINER QUANZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 13,14 * paragraph [0021]; figures 2,3 * * the whole document * [A] 15,16; | [A]US2013115023 (HAIMER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0097]; figures 32,33 * * the whole document *; | [A]US2015336179 (HAIMER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0099] *; | [A]US2016114407 (WU XIAO-YI [CN], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 2 * * paragraph [0017] * |