|
20.12.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2023 |
Communication concerning correction of publication errors in European patent specification |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2023 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.09.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
19.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2022 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.06.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
13.06.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
25.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2022 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2019 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |