EP3597049 - SWEETENED BEVERAGE CONTAINING MINERAL-RICH WATER AND USE OF MINERAL-RICH WATER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SWEETENED BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Red Bull GmbH Am Brunnen 1 5330 Fuschl am See / AT | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nachbagauer, Josef c/o Red Bull Gmbh Am Brunnen 1 5330 Fuschl am See / AT | 02 /
Urban-Klik, Manfred c/o Red Bull Gmbh Am Brunnen 1 5330 Fuschl am See / AT | 03 /
Concin, Roland c/o Red Bull Gmbh Am Brunnen 1 5330 Fuschl am See / AT | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18184713.8 | 20.07.2018 | [2020/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3597049 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3597049 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/07] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3597049 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/38, A23L2/40, A23L2/60, A23L27/00, A23L2/52 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A23L2/38 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L2/68 (US);
A23L27/34 (US);
A23L27/88 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] |
Former [2020/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESÜSSTES GETRÄNK ENTHALTEND MINERALSTOFFREICHES WASSER SOWIE VERWENDUNG VON MINERALSTOFFREICHEM WASSER FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON GESÜSSTEN GETRÄNKEN | [2020/04] | English: | SWEETENED BEVERAGE CONTAINING MINERAL-RICH WATER AND USE OF MINERAL-RICH WATER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SWEETENED BEVERAGES | [2020/04] | French: | BOISSONS SUCRÉES CONTENANT DE L'EAU RICHE EN MINÉRAUX AINSI QU'UTILISATION DE L'EAU RICHE EN MINÉRAUX POUR LA FABRICATION DE BOISSONS SUCRÉES | [2020/04] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 17.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.02.2023 | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | IT | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | NL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | GB | 20.07.2023 | IE | 20.07.2023 | LU | 20.07.2023 | SE | 21.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
IT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
GB | 20.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
SE | 21.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
GB | 20.07.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
SE | 21.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | CZ | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
LU | 20.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | CZ | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 15.02.2023 | |
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 15.02.2023 | |
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.02.2023 | |
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.02.2023 | |
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0141250 (BALTENSPERGER NATREX DIATETIKA [CH]) [X] 1-4,8,14-16,18 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 3; claims 1-6 * [I] 12,17; | [A]US2015223510 (LEE THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0031]; claim 1 ** paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] *; | [X] - Anonymus, "Zitronenlimonade mit Zitronenmelisse und Rohrzucker", (20140929), CHEFKOCH.DE, URL: https://www.chefkoch.de/rezepte/2592041406999868/Zitronenlimonade-mit-Zitronenmelisse-und-Rohrzucker.html, (20190109), XP002787747 [X] 1-11,13-16,18 * the whole document * | [X] - WANG AILI ET AL, "Effect of iron on taste perception and emotional response of sweetened beverage under different water conditions", FOOD QUALITY AND PREFERENCE, LONGMAN SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL, HARLOW, GB, (20160707), vol. 54, doi:10.1016/J.FOODQUAL.2016.06.016, ISSN 0950-3293, pages 58 - 66, XP029683262 [X] 19-22 * page 64, column left, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 65, column left, paragraph 1 * * page 65, column right, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodqual.2016.06.016 | [A] - Bayard Media GmbH & Co. KG, "Deutschlands beste Mineralwässer - Die Wasserliste", (20130726), plus Magazin, URL: https://www.plus-magazin.com/wp-contentnew/uploads/2013/07/Wasser-Liste.pdf, (20190109), XP002787748 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |