EP3431283 - LATEX FORMULATION WITH A MULTIVALENT METAL ION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Llc 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCULLOCH, Bryan L. 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA Pennsylvania 19426 / US | 02 /
ROPER III, John A. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI Michigan 48674 / US | 03 /
ROSEN, Kaitlin 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA Pennsylvania 19426 / US | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2024/01] |
Former [2019/04] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 18184754.2 | 20.07.2018 | [2019/04] | Priority number, date | US201762535298P | 21.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762535298 P | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3431283 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3431283 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/10, C08F265/04, C08L51/00, D21H19/10, D21H19/20, D21H19/58, D21H19/64, D21H21/16, D21H21/52, D21H27/10, D21H17/60 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
C08F265/04 (EP,BR,US);
B32B27/10 (EP,BR,US);
D21H19/20 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
C08J3/03 (BR,US);
C08F20/18 (BR,US);
C08F212/08 (BR,US);
C08F220/06 (KR);
C08J3/05 (KR);
C08K3/22 (BR,US);
C08K3/26 (BR,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,BR,US);
D21H17/34 (KR);
D21H17/60 (EP,US);
D21H17/63 (KR);
D21H19/10 (BR,US);
D21H19/58 (EP,CN,US);
D21H19/64 (EP,CN,US);
D21H21/14 (CN);
D21H21/16 (EP,US);
D21H21/52 (EP,US);
D21H27/10 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (BR,US);
C08J2325/08 (BR,US);
C08J2433/02 (BR,US);
C08J2433/08 (BR,US);
C08J2433/12 (BR,US);
C08K2003/2244 (BR,US);
C08K2003/2296 (BR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F265/04, C08F220/06 (EP,US);
C08F265/04, C08F220/14 (US,EP);
C08L51/003, C08L33/04 (US,EP);
C08L51/003, C08L33/04, C08K3/26 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/04] | B32B27/10, C08F265/04, C08L51/00, D21H19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] |
Former [2019/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LATEXFORMULIERUNG MIT EINEM MEHRWERTIGEN METALLION | [2019/04] | English: | LATEX FORMULATION WITH A MULTIVALENT METAL ION | [2019/04] | French: | FORMULATION DE LATEX AVEC ION MÉTALLIQUE MULTIVALENT | [2019/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 22.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0324416 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-4; claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO2010139732 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]JP2016203982 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [A] 1-10* examples 1-11; claims 1-5 *; | [XP]EP3281989 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [XP] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0005] , [ 0009] , [ 0011] , [ 0012] , [ 0013] , [ 0014] , [ 0015]; examples 1-2; claims 1-10 * | by applicant | WO2009142739 | - KALIHARI, V. et al., Rev. Sci. Instrum., (20130000), vol. 84, page 035104 |