EP3434524 - USER INTERFACE APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 07336 / KR | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Sunghwan 19, Yangjae-daero 11gil Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 18185121.3 | 24.07.2018 | [2019/05] | Priority number, date | KR20170094280 | 25.07.2017 Original published format: KR 20170094280 | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3434524 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3434524 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/00 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
B60R1/24 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06T11/60 (US);
B60K35/00 (KR);
G06F3/005 (KR);
G06T19/006 (KR);
G06T3/20 (US);
H04N5/2628 (US);
H04N5/272 (US);
B60R2300/105 (US);
B60R2300/30 (US);
B60R2300/305 (EP,US);
B60R2300/306 (EP,US);
B60R2300/307 (EP,US);
G05D1/021 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2019/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG SOWIE FAHRZEUG | [2019/05] | English: | USER INTERFACE APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE AND VEHICLE | [2019/05] | French: | APPAREIL INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR VÉHICULE ET VÉHICULE | [2019/05] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 25.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.07.2018 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.07.2018 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 23.10.2019 | |
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2013321629 (ZHANG WENDE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,12,15-18 * paragraph [0019]; figure - * [Y] 6,13; | [YA]US2016263997 (MIZUTANI MASAMI [JP]) [Y] 6 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 17; | [Y]EP3100913 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0022] ** paragraph [0159]; figures 8A, 8B * |