EP3424414 - SHAPE SENSED ULTRASOUND PROBE FOR FRACTIONAL FLOW RESERVE SIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips GmbH Röntgenstraße 22 22335 Hamburg / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/14] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips GmbH Röntgenstraße 22 22335 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2019/02] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Deutschland GmbH Röntgenstrasse 22 22335 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINDER, Tobias c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SCHMITT, Holger c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
GRASS, Michael c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Claveau, Olivier Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 18185242.7 | 09.04.2014 | [2019/02] | Priority number, date | US201361811275P | 12.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361811275 P | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424414 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/02, A61B5/107, G16H40/63, G16H50/50, G16H30/40, A61B8/12, // A61B8/08, A61B8/00, A61B5/06, A61B17/00, A61B34/10, A61B34/20, A61B90/00 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/02028 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/026 (RU,US);
A61B5/065 (EP,RU,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2061 (EP,US);
A61B2090/367 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3735 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3782 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0475 (US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0073 (EP,US);
A61B5/0084 (EP,US);
A61B5/066 (EP,US);
A61B5/1076 (EP,US);
A61B5/4887 (EP,US);
A61B5/6852 (EP,US);
A61B8/085 (EP,US);
A61B8/0891 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FORMERFASSENDE ULTRASCHALLSONDE ZUR FRAKTIONSFLUSSRESERVESIMULATION | [2019/02] | English: | SHAPE SENSED ULTRASOUND PROBE FOR FRACTIONAL FLOW RESERVE SIMULATION | [2019/02] | French: | SONDE À ULTRASONS DE DÉTECTION DE FORME POUR UNE SIMULATION D'UNE RÉSERVE DE DÉBIT FRACTIONNAIRE | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 09.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 15.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14721977.8 / EP2983578 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5830145 (TENHOFF HARM [US]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2335744 (INTRAVASCULAR RES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004051579 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 6, line 6 - page 8, line 23 * * figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US2011071404 (SCHMITT JOSEPH M [US], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0111] * * figure 1a *; | [A]WO2012164481 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2013024418 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 7, line 4 - page 15, line 15 * * figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]WO2013030764 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 6, line 5 - page 11, line 3 * * figure 1 * |